MD HB739 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to adopt a specified set of standards for the training and deployment of SWAT teams and of law enforcement officers not on a SWAT team who conduct no-knock warrant service in the State; and defining "SWAT team" as an agency-designated unit of law enforcement officers who are selected, trained, and equipped to work as a coordinated team to resolve specified critical incidents that may exceed the capabilities of first responders or investigative units.
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsors
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Marc Korman [D] | Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D] |
Del. Pamela Queen [D] | Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-26) (Y: 113 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-26) (Y: 113 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-26) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {592516/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Animals
Arrests
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Law Enforcement
Police Training Commission
Public Safety
Reports
Search and Seizure
Warrants
Weapons
Arrests
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Law Enforcement
Police Training Commission
Public Safety
Reports
Search and Seizure
Warrants
Weapons