MD HB739 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-30-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the size of an estate required to file an estate tax return; altering a certain limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax; repealing a specified limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying before January 1, 2019; and altering a specified limit on the amount of the Maryland estate tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit

Sponsors

Del. The Speaker [?]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Sen. Pamela Beidle [D]
Del. John Bohanan [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Rudolph Cane [D]
Del. Jon Cardin [D]Del. Galen Clagett [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Norman Conway [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Steven DeBoy [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. William Frick [D]
Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Sen. Melony Griffith [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D]Del. Peter Hammen [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]
Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. James Hubbard [D]Del. Jolene Ivey [D]
Del. Mary James [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Sen. Susan Lee [D]
Del. James Malone [D]Del. Brian McHale [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]
Del. Keiffer Mitchell [D]Del. Peter Murphy [D]Del. John Olszewski [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D]Del. David Rudolph [D]Del. Luiz Simmons [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]
Del. Melvin Stukes [D]Del. Shawn Tarrant [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]
Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Sen. Craig Zucker [D]
Sen. Andrew Serafini [R]Del. Kathy Afzali [R]Del. Steven Arentz [R]Del. Susan Aumann [R]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Sen. Gail Bates [R]Del. Wendell Beitzel [R]Del. John Cluster [R]
Del. Donald Dwyer [R]Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R]Del. Donald Elliott [R]Del. William Frank [R]
Del. Ronald George [R]Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [?]Del. Patrick Hogan [R]Sen. Michael Hough [R]
Del. Jay Jacobs [R]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Susan McComas [R]
Del. Tony McConkey [R]Del. Michael McDermott [R]Del. Patrick McDonough [R]Del. Leroy Myers [R]
Sen. Wayne Norman [R]Del. Charles Otto [R]Del. Neil Parrott [R]Sen. Justin Ready [R]
Del. Steven Schuh [R]Del. Kelly Schulz [R]Del. Nancy Stocksdale [R]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]

Roll Calls

2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-10) (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-14) (Y: 119 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612
2014-03-21HouseReturned Passed
2014-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed (36-10)
2014-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-03-19SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-19SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2014-03-14SenateHearing cancelled
2014-03-19SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-10SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2014-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (119-14)
2014-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {335969/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2014-03-05HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0739?ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0739f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0739t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_612_hb0739t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0739_33596901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0739.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0739_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0739_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0739,h-0325&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0739,s-0665&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback