MD HB734 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to focus on certain individuals in the near completer communication campaign for certain academic years; requiring the Commission to use a certain income determination when awarding a Guaranteed Access Grant; providing that a recipient of a Guaranteed Access Grant who becomes ineligible due to an income change shall remain eligible for the full award term if a certain condition is met; authorizing a private career school to award certain scholarships; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Student Financial Assistance - Alterations and Appropriation (Maryland Student Investment Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {183523/1 (Delegate Solomon) Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733821/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB912 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Budgets
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 11 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 1107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 303.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |