MD HB731 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-18 - Recommit to Committee Environmental Matters (Delegate McIntosh)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-18 - Recommit to Committee Environmental Matters (Delegate McIntosh)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $2,000,000 to $5,000,000 the maximum sum of contributions for specified projects under the Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program that are eligible for a specified tax credit; and authorizing the Department of Housing and Community Development to give preference to a proposal for a specified project that benefits a neighborhood conservation district designated under the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development's Neighborhood Stabilization Program.
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-18 | Recommit to Committee Environmental Matters (Delegate McIntosh) | |
2012-03-13 | Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 970818/1 | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Tax Credits
Urban Renewal
Community Facilities and Services
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Tax Credits
Urban Renewal
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0731.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0731f.pdf |