MD HB730 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the minimum threshold for a qualified donation or pledge made to a research endowment of a nonprofit institution of higher education for purposes of the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program if the nonprofit institution of higher education has an annual unrestricted current funds budget of less than $250,000,000.
Title
Economic Development – Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program – Qualifying Donations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB473 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Subjects
Budgets
Economic Development
Gifts
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Nonprofit Organizations
Weights and Measures
Economic Development
Gifts
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Nonprofit Organizations
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 6 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |