MD HB730 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from imposing a deductible, copayment, or coinsurance requirement on diabetes test strips; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Diabetes Test Strips - Prohibition on Deductible, Copayment, and Coinsurance
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] |
Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {256389/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Contracts
Diseases
Equipment
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Diseases
Equipment
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations