MD HB729 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the threshold amount, from $100,000 to $150,000, of a change to an adopted budget that may be made by the County Commissioners of Calvert County only by resolution after complying with certain publication and hearing requirements; altering the process for the County Commissioners of Calvert County to make changes of less than $150,000 to an adopted county budget under certain circumstances.
Title
Calvert County - County Budget - Changes to Adopted Budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {704862/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Jones) Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {704862/1 |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Budgets
Calvert County
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Hearings
Public Information
Public Local Laws
Calvert County
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Hearings
Public Information
Public Local Laws