MD HB729 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors to issue a public cease and desist order or impose a civil fine of no more than $5,000 per offense for specified violations of specified provisions of law under specified circumstances; and providing that each violation of specified provisions of law is a separate offense under specified circumstances.
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief - Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-6) (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-6) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Special Order until 4/11 (Senator King) Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {896081/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Fines
Fraud
Health Occupations
Licenses
Morticians
Penalties and Sentences
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Fines
Fraud
Health Occupations
Licenses
Morticians
Penalties and Sentences