MD HB721 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to serve children in the juvenile services system with programming that provides females with services and programs to meet their specific needs, including diversion programs, community detention services and programs, and reentry services and programs; altering the duties of the State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services to include consulting with and advising the Secretary of the Department on the treatment and programming needs of females in the juvenile justice system; etc.
Title
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {502117/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Gender
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Reports
Discrimination
Gender
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Reports