MD HB72 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering from October 1 to June 30 the date by which the Aquaculture Coordinating Council must make specified proposals and recommendations to the Governor, the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee, and the House Environmental Matters Committee each year.
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Reporting Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-11 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |