MD HB718 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-19 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-19 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Queen Anne's County to the list of counties in which a Class 7 micro-brewery license may be issued; and adding the county to the list of counties in which the license holder may sell at retail beer brewed under the license for consumption off the licensed premises under specified conditions.
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Economic Matters |