MD HB717 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the target per pupil foundation amount in fiscal year 2022; requiring each county board of education to use not less than 7% of the target per pupil foundation amount to provide certain technology resources to students; authorizing a local school system, at the end of each fiscal year, to hold unused funds in a special fund to be used in a subsequent fiscal year; requiring a county board that allocates certain funding to follow certain information technology security standards; etc.
Title
Education – Technology Resources – Funding (Ending the Digital Divide Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-03-11 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2021-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2021-02-22 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB770 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Cybersecurity
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Equipment
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Local Government Mandates
Partnerships
Primary and Secondary Education
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Cybersecurity
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Equipment
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Local Government Mandates
Partnerships
Primary and Secondary Education
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0717?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0717f.pdf |