MD HB716 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - House Requests Senate Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - House Requests Senate Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain units of State government to comply with certain standards and guidelines to ensure that the security of all information systems and applications is managed through a certain framework; establishing that certain provisions of law do not apply to the Office of the Attorney General or the University System of Maryland; requiring certain units to provide an individual with certain means to access certain information and certain third parties; etc.
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2019-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {204732/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {376384/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Biometrics
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Federal Government
Genetics
Identification
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Privacy
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Advertising
Biometrics
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Federal Government
Genetics
Identification
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Privacy
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones