MD HB714 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to provide a certain intended use plan to the General Assembly within 5 days after a plan's publication for public comment; altering the definition of "privately owned wastewater facility" as it relates to the awarding of grants from the Bay Restoration Fund; requiring the Department to report on or provide certain information regarding funding for privately owned wastewater facilities to the General Assembly and the Department of Budget and Management; etc.
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Intended Use Plans and Privately Owned Wastewater Facilities
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-4) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment {293421/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {853424/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {243323/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB354 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Public Buildings and Facilities
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Sunset
Time
Budgets
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Public Buildings and Facilities
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1605.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |