MD HB71 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Elections, in consultation with the Department of Information Technology, to make publicly available on the Internet each meeting agenda made available at least 24 hours in advance of each meeting, live video streaming, and unedited archived video recordings of open meetings; requiring the State Board to prepare written minutes after each meeting; requiring the Department to provide the staff to the State Board necessary to stream live video of the open meetings of the State Board; etc.
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {496989/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Archives
Armed Forces
Ballots
Communications
Cybersecurity
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Notices
Open Government
Public Information
Public Works, Board of
Recordings
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Voting
Armed Forces
Ballots
Communications
Cybersecurity
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Notices
Open Government
Public Information
Public Works, Board of
Recordings
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Video
Voting