MD HB71 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring insurance producers who market the Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program to receive specified continuing education; authorizing the Board of Directors for the Maryland Insurance Plan to adopt regulations that require an insurance producer to receive training about the Program before the insurance producer may market the Program or assist a Medicare beneficiary to enroll in the Program; etc.
Title
Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Training for Insurance Producers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Special Order 4/6 (Senator Brochin) Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-02-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-13 | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2009-10-05 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Drugs
Education
Elderly Persons
Health Insurance
Insurance Administration
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Records
Rules and Regulations
Drugs
Education
Elderly Persons
Health Insurance
Insurance Administration
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Records
Rules and Regulations