MD HB709 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to convene a workgroup to study the establishment of a Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program to provide subsidies to small businesses and nonprofit employers for the purchase of health benefit plans; requiring the Exchange to report the workgroup's recommendations by October 1, 2022; and stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Governor include an appropriation in the annual budget bill, beginning in fiscal year 2024, to establish the Program.
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program - Workgroup
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {273927/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB632 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Subjects
Business Occupations and Professions
Disclosure
Federal Aid
Health - Insurance
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
internet
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Disclosure
Federal Aid
Health - Insurance
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
internet
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 31 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 31 | 123 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |