MD HB708 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, the State Department of Education, and the State Traumatic Brain Injury Advisory Board jointly to study the underidentification of traumatic brain injuries among school-age children and to recommend a process to identify children with existing traumatic brain injuries in schools; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health, the State Department of Education, and the State Traumatic Brain Injury Advisory Board to report their findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Identification of Students With Traumatic Brain Injury - Study and Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback