MD HB708 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the positions eligible for membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include security chief, facility administrator, assistant warden, and warden; authorizing specified individuals to cease membership in the Employees' Pension System and enroll in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; authorizing specified individuals to transfer service credit from the Employees' Pension System to the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; etc.
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Serafini [R] | Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] | Del. Galen Clagett [D] | Del. John Donoghue [D] |
Del. Kevin Kelly [D] | Del. Leroy Myers [R] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-11 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Correctional Officers
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Correctional Officers
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset