MD HB706 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB130
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on LGBTQ Affairs in the Governor's Office of Community Initiatives; providing for the appointment, qualifications, terms, and removal of Commission members; requiring the Commission to elect annually a chair and vice chair and to meet under certain circumstances; authorizing the Commission to appoint a director under certain circumstances; establishing that the director is a special appointment; establishing the duties of the director and the Commission; etc.
Title
Commission on LGBTQ Affairs - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-28) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {336084/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB706 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Development
Discrimination
Elections
Gender
Gifts
Grants
Public Officials
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Sexual Orientation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Development
Discrimination
Elections
Gender
Gifts
Grants
Public Officials
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Sexual Orientation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |