MD HB706 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Charles County to issue an entertainment concessionaire license to specified persons in conjunction with an entertainment facility; authorizing the Board to issue an entertainment facility license to a person that owns an entertainment facility where video lottery terminals and table games are offered to the public; providing that beer, wine, and liquor sold under either license may be taken and consumed anywhere on the licensed premises; etc.
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Concessionaire and Entertainment Facility Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Gaming
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Lottery
Video
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Gaming
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Lottery
Video