MD HB706 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the purpose and authorized uses of the Reforestation Fund to include tree planting on private land and financing the prevention of and response to forest health emergencies; defining the term "no net loss of forest"; altering the range of acres of land that a person is required to own or lease to be eligible for a specified income tax subtraction modification; exempting specified stream restoration projects from the requirements of the Forest Conservation Act; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-27) (Y: 107 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-27) (Y: 107 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-1) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-27) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {730912/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Construction
Emergencies
Exemptions
Fines
Fire Protection
Flood Control
Forests and Parks
Income Tax
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers and Streams
Sediment Control
Trees
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Construction
Emergencies
Exemptions
Fines
Fire Protection
Flood Control
Forests and Parks
Income Tax
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers and Streams
Sediment Control
Trees