MD HB704 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to March 15, 2015, a specified reporting requirement of a registered debt settlement services provider; extending the deadline for specified reporting requirements of the Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation and the Consumer Protection Division in the Office of the Attorney General; extending to June 30, 2016, the termination date for the Maryland Debt Settlement Services Act; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension
Sponsors
Del. Michael Vaughn [D] | Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Del. Keiffer Mitchell [D] | Del. Darren M. Swain [D] |
Del. Frank Turner [D] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277 |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Debt Collection
Debt Management
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Reports
Sunset
Unfair Trade Practices
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Debt Collection
Debt Management
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Reports
Sunset
Unfair Trade Practices