MD HB702 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a secured party to petition a circuit court for leave to immediately commence an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property if the property is vacant and abandoned under specified circumstances; requiring a secured party to send a copy of a specified petition to specified persons under specified circumstances; requiring a court to rule on a specified petition promptly after the petition is filed; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {600219/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Circuit Courts
Counties
Financial Regulation, Division of
Foreclosure
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Public Officials
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Circuit Courts
Counties
Financial Regulation, Division of
Foreclosure
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Public Officials
Real Property
Rules and Regulations