MD HB701 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the information that must be included in the statement of factors required to be included in a request for proposals for a lease of real property to be used by a local department of social services to include the geographic boundaries of the area where the facility will be located.
Title
Procurement - Lease of Property for Local Departments of Social Services - Requests for Proposals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {306281/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Boundaries
General Services, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Leases and Rent
Notices
Procurement
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
General Services, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Leases and Rent
Notices
Procurement
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
State Government - Regulations and Procedures