MD HB700 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from committing certain acts against a group because of the group's race, color, religious beliefs, sexual orientation, gender, disability, or national origin, or because the group is homeless.
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Group Victim
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-6) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |