MD HB700 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revising, updating, reorganizing, and clarifying Title 1 of the Maryland Uniform Commercial Code (MUCC) relating to general provisions applicable to the MUCC; establishing a short title; clarifying the transactions to which Title 1 of the MUCC applies; providing for the effect of Title 1 of the MUCC on a specified federal law; authorizing the subordination of an obligation or a right to performance under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Revisions to Title 1
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-03-23 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments 863493/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Federal Government
Leases and Rent
Security Interests
Signatures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Uniform Laws
Contracts
Federal Government
Leases and Rent
Security Interests
Signatures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Uniform Laws