MD HB70 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to a license to keep a billiard table for commercial use in the State.
Title
Business Regulation - Billiard Table License - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90 |
2016-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-02-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-01-27 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-14 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cecil County
Commerce and Business
Fees
Gaming
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Sports and Recreation
Washington County
Baltimore County
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cecil County
Commerce and Business
Fees
Gaming
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Sports and Recreation
Washington County