MD HB7 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with certain State agencies, to adopt regulations to require periodic inspections for the presence of mold hazards and mold or moisture problems in each occupied public or nonpublic school facility in the State; authorizing the Department of the Environment along with the State Department of Education, to grant a waiver from certain inspection requirements; requiring an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly on the findings of the inspections; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Mold Hazards and Mold or Moisture Problems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2020-01-28HouseHearing canceled (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2020-01-13HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2020-01-09HouseHearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
2020-01-09HouseHearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
2019-07-15HousePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment61601(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61602(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61603(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment61604(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback