MD HB698 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a vehicle manufacturer from recovering by certain means all or a portion of its costs for compensating a vehicle dealer for vehicle preparation and delivery or warranty or recall repairs by arbitrarily reducing the amount of the compensation that is due to the dealer, or imposing a separate charge, surcharge, or other burden; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-19) (Y: 116 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-19) (Y: 116 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-2) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {318570/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-19) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Fees
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Repair
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Warranties
Fees
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Repair
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Warranties