MD HB698 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law that authorize under certain circumstances, a person to plant, cultivate, process, sell, or buy industrial hemp in the State; repealing an authorization for the Department of Agriculture or an institution of higher education to grow or cultivate industrial hemp; establishing an Industrial Hemp Pilot Program to authorize and facilitate the research of industrial hemp and certain aspects for agricultural, industrial, or commercial purposes; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2018-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {680813/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Commerce and Business
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Licenses
Records
Registration
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Agriculture, Department of
Cannabis
Commerce and Business
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Licenses
Records
Registration
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations