MD HB698 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to accept an individual's valid United States military identification card as evidence of the individual's lawful status, as defined in a specified provision of law, age, and identity for purposes of the issuance of an identification card, a moped operator's permit, or a driver's license; and requiring the Administration to adopt regulations consistent with the Act.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Acceptable Source Documents - Valid Military
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-25 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2011-02-25 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0698.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0698f.pdf |