MD HB697 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Favorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a certain provision of law applying certain provisions of the federal Affordable Care Act to certain health insurance coverage issued or delivered in the State by certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, or health maintenance organizations; prohibiting certain carriers from excluding or limiting certain benefits or denying coverage under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain carriers from establishing certain rules for eligibility based on health status factors; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission

Sponsors

Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]
Del. Heather Bagnall [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Regina Boyce [D]
Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]
Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Jon Cardin [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]
Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Debra Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]
Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Michele Guyton [D]Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]
Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]
Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Ken Kerr [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. David Moon [D]
Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Emily Shetty [D]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]
Del. Jared Solomon [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]
Del. Jen Terrasa [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Courtney Watson [D]
Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (131-6)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {716486/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback