MD HB691 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health to distribute at least $400,000 annually from the Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund to the qualified nonprofit organization responsible for the maintenance and operation of a certain donor registry; requiring that any unused funds distributed to a certain qualified nonprofit entity revert to the Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund at the end of each fiscal year; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Title
Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Donor Registry - Annual Funding
Sponsors
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D] | Del. James Tarlau [D] |
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Sen. Karen Lewis Young [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444 |
2018-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-4) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {276289/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Estates and Trusts
Health
Health, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Organ Donorship
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Estates and Trusts
Health
Health, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Organ Donorship
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset