MD HB69 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2022, a food service business from providing certain single-use food or beverage products to a certain customer unless requested by the customer; requiring a food service business to maintain a limited supply of certain single-use food and beverage products for certain customers; prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2024, an owner, an operator, or a manager of a lodging establishment with 51 or more rooms from providing certain personal cleansing products in small plastic bottles; etc.
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions
Sponsors
Del. Sara Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation |
2020-09-16 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Attorney General
Beverage Containers
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Food
Hotels and Motels
Penalties and Sentences
Plastics
Restaurants
restrooms
Beverage Containers
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Food
Hotels and Motels
Penalties and Sentences
Plastics
Restaurants
restrooms
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |