MD HB69 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the Calvert County property tax specified personal property purchased by businesses from July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2018; exempting specified personal property from the Calvert County property tax beginning on July 1, 2018; providing that specified personal property remains subject to the Calvert County property tax; providing that specified personal property subject to a payment in lieu of taxes agreement shall be subject to the Calvert County property tax on the termination of the agreement; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Bingo
Cable Television
Calvert County
Commerce and Business
Equipment
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Railroads
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities
Cable Television
Calvert County
Commerce and Business
Equipment
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Railroads
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities