MD HB689 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each community college to ensure all student advisors are trained on the unique needs and resources available for students who are veterans, to employ at least one employee who, as a component of the employee's job duties and responsibilities, provides certain enrollment and advising services to current and prospective students who are veterans, and to establish a veterans resource center on the community college campus.
Title
Colonel Todd J. Hixson Memorial Resource Center Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-02 | House | Floor Amendment {583327/1 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted |
2018-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {415169/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |