MD HB686 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating requirements for collection agencies and certain non-depository financial institutions to maintain separate licenses for branch locations and authorizing them to conduct business at multiple licensed locations under a single license; and altering certain other requirements and provisions governing the licensing and regulation of collection agencies and certain non-depository financial institutions, including applications, assessments, and bond requirements.
Title
Financial Regulation - Modernizing Licensing of Non-Depository Institutions and Elimination of Branch License Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-07 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Assessments
Bonds
Claims
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Debt Collection
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Mortgages
Names
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Bonds
Claims
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Debt Collection
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Mortgages
Names
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology