MD HB686 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 824
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 824
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending from February 2019 to February 2021 the month after which the Comptroller is required to begin withholding from certain quarterly income tax distributions certain amounts owed by certain local governments to the Local Reserve Account; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve Account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 824 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-5) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {595461/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Comptroller
Counties
Counties - Generally
Income Tax
Municipal Corporations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Taxes - Income
Counties
Counties - Generally
Income Tax
Municipal Corporations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Taxes - Income