MD HB686 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Strategic Demolition and Smart Growth Impact Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund is to provide grants and loans to assist in predevelopment activities, including demolition, land assembly, architecture and engineering, and site development for revitalization projects in an area designated as a sustainable community; requiring the Governor to include an appropriation to the Fund in fiscal year 2018 of $25,625,000 to be allocated to projects in Baltimore City and throughout the State; etc.
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Strategic Demolition and Smart Growth Impact Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hershey) {823021/1 Rejected (15-30) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-27) (Y: 112 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hershey) {823021/1 Rejected (15-30) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-27) (Y: 112 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30 |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-5) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {823021/1 Rejected (15-30) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Special Order until 3/30 (Senator McFadden) Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-27) |
2016-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2016-02-19 | House | Substitute Committee Amendment {654265/1 Adopted |
2016-02-19 | House | Committee Amendment {964666/1 Withdrawn |
2016-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 12:30 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Community Development
Construction
Economic and Community Development
Governor
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Smart Growth
Baltimore City
Budgets
Community Development
Construction
Economic and Community Development
Governor
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Smart Growth