MD HB686 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding an off-sale privilege to the Class B beer and light wine license issued for hotels and restaurants in the City of Takoma Park; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2014.
Title
Montgomery County - City of Takoma Park - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B On- and
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-19 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Hotels and Motels
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Restaurants
Sunset
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Hotels and Motels
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Restaurants
Sunset