MD HB685 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the date by which certain provisions of law relating to minority business participation goals for certain applicants or licensees are of no effect and may not be enforced from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2020; and altering a deadline for a certain reporting requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Enforcement and Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 280
2019-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFloor Committee Amendment {645061/1 Adopted
2019-03-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback