MD HB685 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Baltimore City Council provide logistical and financial assistance to Baltimore City Public Schools for specified shared services; and requiring the Baltimore City Council to report specified information to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Public Schools and City Council - Logistical and Financial Assistance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329
2017-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2017-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-1)
2017-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {864065/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2017-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-01HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0685&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0685f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0685t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_329_hb0685t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0685_86406501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0685.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0685_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0685_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0685,h-0815&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0685,s-1195&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback