MD HB683 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the imposition of a maximum number of subscribers to a community solar energy generating system under the Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program; providing for an increase in the generating capacity and capacity limits to be included in the pilot program; altering the termination date of the pilot program to be no sooner than December 31, 2024; and extending to July 1, 2022, the submission date of a certain report on the pilot program to certain committees of the General Assembly.
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-34) (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-34) (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-34) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Energy
Energy Matters
Reports
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Energy
Energy Matters
Reports
Utilities
Utility Regulation