MD HB682 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1436
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition in Baltimore County against hunting or attempting to hunt nongame birds and mammals without first obtaining a hunting license.
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-8) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB427 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
HB1436 (Carry Over) 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
HB1436 (Carry Over) 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |