MD HB682 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1085
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-20 - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-20 - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain biomass systems primarily fueled with qualifying biomass other than animal manure to be eligible for renewable energy credits; and altering the definition of "thermal biomass system".
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal Biomass Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-20 | House | Referred to interim study by Economic Matters |
2021-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB682 (Carry Over) 2021-03-20 - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
SB549 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
SB549 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |