MD HB682 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Behavioral Health Advisory Council, in consultation with specified agencies, specified health providers, and specified stakeholders, to develop a strategic plan for ensuring that clinical crisis walk-in services and mobile crisis teams are available statewide, 7 days a week and 24 hours a day; requiring the Council to submit an annual report on or before December 31, 2016, and include an update on the development of the specified strategic plan; etc.
Title
Behavioral Health Advisory Council - Clinical Crisis Walk-In Services and Mobile Crisis Teams - Strategic Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406 |
2016-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {416083/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Emergencies
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Mental Health
Public Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Emergencies
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Mental Health
Public Health
Reports
Substance Abuse