MD HB679 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain individuals granted special access to the State legislative complex from unlawfully harassing or discriminating against certain individuals; requiring the Department of General Services, if requested, to revoke access granted to a person who violates certain provisions of the Act or a regulated lobbyist who violates a certain provision of law; providing that sexual harassment prevention training for employees of the University system of Maryland may consist of webinar, computer-based, or online training; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {787873/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {924964/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0679&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0679f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0679t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0679e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_222_hb0679e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0679_92496401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0679_78787301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0679.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0679_exn.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0679_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0452.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0679_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0960.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1204.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback