MD HB679 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the council of unit owners of a condominium to amend the bylaws of the condominium, by at least 51% majority, for the purpose of requiring all unit owners to maintain condominium unit owner insurance policies on their units; authorizing the bylaws of a condominium to require each unit owner to maintain a condominium owner insurance policy on the unit; and requiring specified bylaws to require each unit owner to provide evidence of specified insurance coverage to the council of unit owners annually.
Title
Real Property - Condominiums - Amendment to Bylaws to Require Unit Insurance
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (39-7) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-18 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-18 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (103-35) | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters |