MD HB678 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain principles of public higher education in the State to include a principle that public higher education in Maryland should be committed to promoting diversity and inclusion at certain institutions by attracting and graduating a diverse student body committed to service; requiring certain public senior higher education institutions to adopt a certain written policy related to targeted recruitment and outreach efforts in certain communities of interest; etc.
Title
Public Higher Education - Communities of Interest - Targeted Recruitment and Outreach Efforts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38 |
2024-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-11) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-23) |
2024-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {723022/1 Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Awareness and Outreach
Data
Demographics
Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion
Higher Education
Public Schools
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Special Events
State Universities and Colleges
Data
Demographics
Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion
Higher Education
Public Schools
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Special Events
State Universities and Colleges
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 10 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 15 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |